Guide :

magic square 16 boxes each box has to give a number up to16 but when added any 4 boxes equal 34

hi friends, in magic square there 16 boxes each box has to give each number upto 16 but when we add any 4 boxes we should get 34 in this question it is a magic square if we add each row we get 34 if it is in diagonal also pls replay fast friends

Research, Knowledge and Information :


Magic Square - Mathematische Basteleien


The number 15 is called the magic number of the 3x3 square. ... The magic number is (1+2+...+15+16):4 = 34. ... You find the complementary square, if you replace each ...
Read More At : www.mathematische-basteleien.de...

Math Forum - Ask Dr. Math


... four center squares and four outside corner squares each add up to a desired number? ... to build a 4 x 4 magic square ... magic square is 34, ...
Read More At : mathforum.org...

BOOKING INFO


... Row B 6 and 31, C 4, 5, 31, 32, D 4, 5, 32, 33, E 2, 3, 33, 34, F 3, 4, ... bargain at £29.75 each. We had our own private box ... up to 4 off the centre aisle ...
Read More At : www.theatremonkey.com...

The Geezer Cookbook - macscouter.com


The Geezer Cookbook. ... Cut each steak into 4 equal pieces. ... Add tomato sauce into which 1 tsp flour has been added.
Read More At : www.macscouter.com...

Service Technician - Pool Route Pros Inc.


... a swimming pool & spa service technician in ... (1 filled orange D.E. scoop) per each 10 square ... When sanitizing a filter be sure to clean up any mess ...
Read More At : www.poolroutepros.com...

The Geezer Cookbook - t1699.com


Welcome to the Geezer Cookbook on ... 16. Magic Mushroom Beef Rolls ... each steak into 4 equal ...
Read More At : www.t1699.com...

TCL's New Roku 4K TV Is Very Good and Beautifully Cheap


The new P-Series opens up a whole new ... The difference a TV that has those three ... or Nvidia Shield into the P-Series and enjoy your preferred set-top box ...
Read More At : gizmodo.com...

Catalogue (1) | Pic Microcontroller | Electrical Connector


Shop1 Moulton Centre, Cnr. ... The number of tones may be selected up to a maximum of ... than enough for mechanical music box. Each has adhesive backing and is ...
Read More At : fr.scribd.com...

Suggested Questions And Answer :


magic square 16 boxes each box has to give a number up to16 but when added any 4 boxes equal 34

The magic square consists of 4X4 boxes. We don't yet know whether all the numbers from 1 to 16 are there. Each row adds up to 34, so since there are 4 rows the sum of the numbers must be 4*34=136. When we add the numbers from 1 to 16 we get 136, so we now know that the square consists of all the numbers between 1 and 16. We can arrange the numbers 1 to 16 into four groups of four such that within the group there are 2 pairs of numbers {x y 17-x 17-y}. These add up to 34. We need to find 8 numbers represented by A, B, ..., H, so that all the rows, columns and two diagonals add up to 34. A+B+17-A+17-B=34, C+D+17-C+17-D=34, ... (rows) A+C+17-A+17-C=34, ... (columns) Now there's a problem, because the complement of A, for example, appears in the first row and the first column, which would imply duplication and mean that we would not be able to use up all the numbers between 1 and 16. To avoid this problem we need to consider other ways of making up the sum 34 in the columns. Let's use an example. The complement of 1 is 16 anewd its accompanying pair in the row is 2+15; but if we have the sum 1+14 we need another pair that adds up to 19 so that the sum 34 is preserved. We would perhaps need 3+16. We can't use 16 and 15 because they're being used in a row, and we can't use 14, because it's being used in a column, so we would have to use 6+13 as the next available pair. So the row pairs would be 1+16 and 2+15; the column pairs 1+14 and 6+13; and the diagonal pairs 1+12 and 10+11. Note that we've used up 10 of the 16 numbers so far. This type of logic applies to every box, apart from the middle two boxes of each side of the square (these are part of a row and column only), because they appear in a row, a column and diagonal. There are only 10 equations but 16 numbers. In the following sets, in which each of the 16 boxes is represented by a letter of the alphabet between A and P, the sum of the members of each set is 34: {A B C D} {A E I M} {A F K P} {B F J N} {C G K O} {D H L P} {D G J M} {E F G H} {I J K L} {M N O P} The sums of the numbers in the following sets in rows satisfy the magic square requirement of equalling 34. This is a list of all possibilities. However, there are also 24 ways of arranging the numbers in order. We've also seen that we need 10 out of the 16 numbers to satisfy the 34 requirement for numbers that are part of a row, column and diagonal; but the remaining numbers (the central pair of numbers on each side of the square) only use 7 out of 16. The next problem is to find out how to combine the arrangements. The vertical line divides pairs of numbers that could replace the second pair of the set. So 1 16 paired with 2 15 can also be paired with 3 14, 4 13, etc. The number of alternative pairs decreases as we move down the list. 17 X 17: 1 16 2 15 | 3 14 | 4 13 | 5 12 | 6 11 | 7 10 | 8 9 2 15 3 14 | 1 16 | 4 13 | 5 12 | 6 11 | 7 10 | 8 9 3 14 4 13 | 1 16 | 2 15 | 5 12 | 6 11 | 7 10 | 8 9 4 13 5 12 | 1 16 | 2 15 | 3 14 | 6 11 | 7 10 | 8 9 5 12 6 11 | 1 16 | 2 15 | 3 14 | 4 13 | 7 10 | 8 9 6 11 7 10 | 1 16 | 2 15 | 3 14 | 4 13 | 5 12 | 8 9 7 10 8 9 | 1 16 | 2 15 | 3 14 | 4 13 | 5 12 | 6 11 16 X 18: 1 15 2 16 | 4 14 | 5 13 | 6 12 | 7 11 | 8 10 2 14 3 15 | 5 13 | 6 12 | 7 11 | 8 10 3 13 4 14 | 2 16 | 6 12 | 7 11 | 8 10 4 12 5 13 | 2 16 | 3 15 | 7 11 | 8 10 5 11 6 12 | 2 16 | 3 15 | 4 14 | 8 10 6 10 7 11 | 2 16 | 3 15 | 4 14 | 5 13 7 9 8 10 | 2 16 | 3 15 | 4 14 | 5 13 | 6 12 15 X 19: 1 14 3 16 | 4 15 | 6 13 | 7 12 | 8 11 2 13 4 15 | 3 16 | 5 14 | 7 12 | 8 11 3 12 5 14 | 4 15 | 6 13 | 8 11 4 11 6 13 | 3 16 | 5 14 | 7 12 5 10 7 12 | 3 16 | 4 15 | 6 13 | 8 11 6 9 8 11 | 3 16 | 4 15 | 5 14 | 7 12  7 8 9 10 | 3 16 | 4 15 | 5 14 | 6 13 14 X 20: 1 13 4 16 | 5 15 | 6 14 | 8 12 | 9 11 2 12 5 15 | 4 16 | 6 14 | 7 13 | 9 11 3 11 6 14 | 4 16 | 5 15 | 7 13 | 8 12 4 10 7 13 | 5 15 | 6 14 | 8 12 | 9 11 5 9 8 12 | 4 16 | 6 14 | 7 13 | 9 11 6 8 9 11 | 4 16 | 5 15 | 7 13 13 X 21: 1 12 5 16 | 6 15 | 7 14 | 8 13 | 10 11 2 11 6 15 | 5 16 | 7 14 | 8 13 | 9 12 3 10 7 14 | 5 16 | 6 15 | 8 13 | 9 12 4 9 8 13 | 5 16 | 6 15 | 7 14 | 10 11 5 8 9 12 | 6 15 | 7 14 | 10 11 6 7 10 11 | 5 16 | 8 13 | 9 12 12 X 22: 1 11 6 16 | 7 15 | 8 14 | 9 13 | 10 12 2 10 7 15 | 6 16 | 8 14 | 9 13 | 10 12 3 9 8 14 | 6 16  4 8 9 13 | 6 16 | 7 15  5 7 10 12 | 6 16 11 X 23: 1 10 7 16 | 8 15 | 9 14 2 9 8 15 | 7 16  3 8 9 14 | 7 16  10 X 24: 1 9 8 16 To give an example of how the list could be used, let's take row 3 in 17 X 17 {3 14 4 13}. If 3 is the number in the row column and diagonal, then we need to inspect the list to find another row in a different group containing 3 that doesn't duplicate any other numbers. So we move on to 15 X 19 and we find {3 12 8 11} and another row in 13 X 21 with {3 10 5 16}. So we've used the numbers 3, 4, 5, 8, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 16. That leaves 1, 2, 6, 7, 9, 15. In fact, one answer is: 07 12 01 14 (see 15x19) 02 13 08 11 16 03 10 05 09 06 15 04
Read More: ...

0.8x0.9x0.8 is how many square inches

0.8x0.9x0.8 is how many square inches I need to know how many square inches the above would equal You will not get SQUARE INCHES by multiplying three numbers. You get CUBIC INCHES. Multiplying the first two numbers gives you a rectangular area, measured in square inches. Then, multiplying by the third number gives you a cubic volume, with height added to the rectangular area. 0.8 x 0.9 = 0.72 square inches, a flat area 0.72 x 0.8 = 0.575 cubic inches, a block, with volume
Read More: ...

what 3 numbers when added together will give you the same total as when they are multiplied?

let number =x , so add them together gives you 3x then multiple them equal to x^3 so solve the two equation then you have x= 0,square root of 3,_ square root of 3 :)
Read More: ...

10 vedic maths rules for class IX

2 instead of 5: 34/5 can be calculated by multiplying 34 by 2 instead of dividing by 5. 34*2=68. We just move the decimal point one place to the left: 34/5=6.8. 124/5=24.8 because 124*2=248. Move the decimal point: 248 becomes 24.8. 34*5 is the same as 34/2=17 but we add a zero to make 17 into 170. 73*5 is the same as 73/2=36.5 then move the decimal point one place to the right (or add zero): 36.5 becomes 365=73*5. So we only need to know how to multiply and divide by 2 to divide and multiply by 5. We just move the decimal point. Divisibility by 9 or remainder after dividing by 9. All multiples of 9 contain digits which added together give 9. As we add the digits together, each time the result goes over 9 we add the digits of the result together and use that result and continue in this way up to the last digit. Is 12345 divisible by 9? Add the digits together 1+2+3=6. When we add 4 we get 10, so we add 1 and zero=1 then we add 5 to get 6. The number is not exactly divisible by 9, but the remainder is 6. We can also ignore any 9's in the number. Now try 67959. We can ignore the two 9's. 6+7=13, and 1+3=4; 4+5=9, so 67959 is divisible by 9. Multiplying by 11. Example: 132435*11. We write down the first and last digits 1 ... 5. Now we add the digits in pairs from the left a digit step at a time. So 1+3=4; 3+2=5: 2+4=6; 4+3=7; 3+5=8. Write these new digits between 1 and 5 and we get 1456785=132435*11. But we had no carryovers here. Now try 864753*11. Write down the first and last digits: 8 ... 3. 8+6=14, so we cross out the 8 and replace it with 8+1=9, giving us 94 ... 3. Next pair: 6+4=10. Again we go over 10 so we cross out 4 and make it 5. Now we have 950 ... 3. 4+7=11, so we have 9511 ... 3. 7+5=12, giving us 95122 ... 3; 5+3=8, giving us the final result 9512283.  Divisibility by 11. We add alternate digits and then we add the digits we missed. Subtract one sum from the other and if the result is zero the original number was divisible by 11. Example: 1456785. 1 5 7 5 make up one set of alternate digits and the other set is 4 6 8. 1+5+7=13. We drop the ten and keep 3 in mind to add to 5 to give us 8. Now 4 6 8: 4+6=10, drop the ten and add 0 to 8 to give us 8 (or ignore the zero). 8-8=0 so 11 divides into 1456785. Now 9512283: set 1 is 9 1 2 3 and set 2 is 5 2 8; 9+1=0 (when we drop the ten); 2+3=5; set 1 result is 5; 5+2+8=5 after dropping the ten, and 5-5=0 so 9512283 is divisible by 11. Nines remainder for checking arithmetic. We can check the result of addition, subtraction, multiplication and (carefully) division. Using Method 2 above we can reduce operands to a single digit. Take the following piece of arithmetic: 17*56-19*45+27*84. We'll assume we have carried out this sum and arrived at an answer 2365. We reduce each number to a single digit using Method 2: 8*2-1*9+9*3. 9's have no effect so we can replace 9's by 0's: 8*2 is all that remains. 8*2=16 and 1+6=7. This tells us that the result must reduce to 7 when we apply Method 2: 2+3+6=11; 1+1=2 and 2+5=7. So, although we can't be sure we have the right answer we certainly don't have the wrong answer because we arrived at the number 7 for the operands and the result. For division we simply use the fact that a/b=c+r where c is the quotient and r is the remainder. We can write this as a=b*c+r and then apply Method 2, as long as we have an actual remainder and not a decimal or fraction. Divisibility by 3. This is similar to Method 2. We reduce a number to a single digit. If this digit is 3, 6 or 9 (in other words, divisible by 3) then the whole number is divisible by 3. Divisibility by 6. This is similar to Method 6 but we also need the last digit of the original number to be even (0, 2, 4, 6 or 8). Divisibility by 4. If 4 divides into the last two digits of a number then the whole number is divisible by 4. Using 4 or 2 times 2 instead of 25 for multiplication and division. 469/25=469*4/100=1876/100=18.76. 538*25=538*100/4=134.5*100=13450. We could also double twice: 469*2=938, 938*2=1876, then divide by 100 (shift the decimal point two places to the left). And we can divide by 2 twice: 538/2=269, 269/2=134.5 then multiply by 100 (shift the decimal point two places left or add zeroes). Divisibility by 8. If 8 divides into the last three digits of a number then the whole number is divisible by 8. Using 8 or 2 times 2 times 2 instead of 125 for multiplication and division. Similar to Method 9, using 125=1000/8. Using addition instead of subtraction. 457-178. Complement 178: 821 and add: 457+821=1278, now reduce the thousands digit by 1 and add it to the units: 278+1=279; 457-178=279. Example: 1792-897. First match the length of 897 to 1792 be prefixing a zero: 0897; complement this: 9102. 1792+9102=1894. Reduce the thousands digit by 1 and add to the result: 894+1=895. Example: 14703-2849. 2849 becomes 02849, then complements to 97150. 14703+97150=111853; reduce the ten-thousands digit by 1 and and add to the result: 11854. Squaring numbers ending in 5. Example: 75^2. Start by writing the last two digits, which are always 25. Take the 7 and multiply by 1 more than 7, which is 8, so we get 56. Place this before the 25: 5625 is the square of 75. The square of 25 is ...25, preceded by 2*3=6, so we get 625. All numbers ending in 0 or 5 are exactly divisible by 5 (see also Method 1). All numbers ending in zero are exactly divisible by 10. All numbers ending in 00, 25, 50 or 75 are divisible by 25. Divisibility by 7. Example: is 2401 divisible by 7? Starting from the left with a pair of digits we multiply the first digit by 3 and add the second to it: 24: 3*2+4=10; now we repeat the process because we have 2 digits: 3*1+0=3. We take this single digit and the one following 24, which is a zero: 3*3+0=9. When we get a single digit 7, 8 or 9 we simply subtract 7 from it: in this case we had 9 so 9-7=2 and the single digit is now 2. Finally in this example we bring in the last digit: 3*2+1=7, but 7 is reduced to 0. This tells us the remainder after dividing 2401 by 7 is zero, so 2401 is divisible by 7. Another example: 1378. 3*1+3=6; 3*6=18 before adding the next digit, 7 (we can reduce this to a single digit first): 3*1+8=3*1+1=4; now add the 7: 4+7=4+0=4;  3*4=12; 3*1+2+8=5+1=6, so 6 is the remainder after dividing 1378 by 7.  See also my solution to: http://www.mathhomeworkanswers.org/72132/addition-using-vedic-maths?show=72132#q72132
Read More: ...

What two numbers added up to get 12 but when multipled equal 54

Let a and b represent the numbers, then a+b=12 ands ab=54. Substitute b=12-a in the product: a(12-a)=54. 12a-a^2=54, so a^2-12a+54=0. Before applying the quadratic formula, we note that the result is going to b complex because the roots have to be positive because the constant 54 is positive and the minimum sum of the roots is greater than 12 (minimum would be about 14.7). For example, 1+54, 2+27, 3+18, 6+9, are all greater than 12. The formula gives (12+sqrt(144-216))/2=(12+sqrt(-72))/2=(12+6sqrt(-2))/2=6+3isqrt(2). In these solutions i is the imaginary number equal to the square root of -1. So the two numbers are 6+3isqrt(2) and 6-3isqrt(2). The sum of these is 12 and the product is 36+18=54.
Read More: ...

how to evaluate expression

The quadratic x^2+10x+23=0 has roots -5+sqrt(2). We can write the quadratic x(x+10)=-23, so x=-23/(x+10). We can bring in sqrt(2) iteratively: put x=-5 into the expression on the right: x=-23/5=-4.6. Then we put x=-4.6 into the expression so we have x=-23/5.4=-4.259259... Put x=-4.259259 into the expression we get x=-4.0064516, and then we get x=-3.83746, and so on until after numerous iterations (repeating the process) we get to -3.585786438. This is very close to one of the roots of the equation, in other words -5+sqrt(2). The initial value of -5 guides the process to this root rather than the other root. Therefore, we can evaluate sqrt(2) by adding 5 to this number: 5-3.585786438=1.414213562. This iterative process can be performed by a calculator by repeatedly putting the value of x back into the same expression to get the next value of x. Some calculators allow you to build up an expression and keep applying it iteratively as you get each approximation. Using this method you can see the values converging until you reach the accuracy limits of the calculator and you get an unchanging result. You can apply this method using x=1/(x-2). Start with x=1, then you get x=-0.5, then -0.4, then -0.4167 up to -0.4142135624. Then you add 1 to get sqrt(2). This gives you a more accurate answer because we have an extra digit 4 at the end. The iterative process can give you slightly better accuracy than simply working out sqrt(2) directly on your calculator.
Read More: ...

what two numbers added together make 49 but when multiplied equal a negative 100

what two numbers added together make 49 but when multiplied equal a negative 100 x + y = 49            xy = -100 y = 49 - x            x(49 - x) = -100 x(49 - x) = -100 49x - x^2 = -100 -1 * (49x - x^2) = -100 * -1 -49x + x^2 = 100 x^2 - 49x = 100                  1/2 of 49 is 24.5 Complete the square x^2 - 49x + 24.5^2 = 100 + 24.5^2 (x - 24.5)^2 = 100 + 600.25 = 700.25 Take the square root of both sides x - 24.5 = ±26.462237    This has been rounded, so multiplication that                                         use these values will be slightly off x = 26.462237 + 24.5 = 50.962237 x = -26.462237 + 24.5 = -1.962237 50.962237 + (-1.962237) = 49 50.962237 - 1.962237 = 49 50.962237 * (- 1.962237) = -99.999987 The two numbers are 50.962237 and -1.962237
Read More: ...

show that the function f(x)= sqrt (x^2 +1) satisfies the 2 hypotheses of the Mean Value Theorem

f(x) = sqrt(x^2 + 1) ; [(0, sqrt(8)] Okay, so for the Mean Value Theorem, two things have to be true: f(x) has to be continuous on the interval [0, sqrt(8)] and f(x) has to be differentiable on the interval (0, sqrt(8)). First find where sqrt(x^2 + 1) is continous on. We know that for square roots, the number has to be greater than or equal to zero (definitely no negative numbers). So set the inside greater than or equal to zero and solve for x. You'll get an imaginary number because when you move 1 to the other side, it'll be negative. So, this means that the number inside the square root will always be positive, which makes sense because the x is squared and you're adding 1 to it, not subtracting. There would be no way to get a negative number under the square root in this situation. Therefore, since f(x) is continuos everywhere, (-infinity, infinity), then f(x) is continuous on [0, sqrt(8)]. Now you have to check if it is differentiable on that interval. To check this, you basically do the same but with the derivative of the function. f'(x) = (1/2)(x^2+1)^(-1/2)x2x which equals to f'(x) = x/sqrt(x^2+1). So for the derivative of f, you have a square root on the bottom, but notice that the denominator is exactly the same as the original function. Since we can't have the denominator equal to zero, we set the denominator equal to zero and solve to find the value of x that will make it equal to zero. However, just like in the first one, it will never reach zero because of the x^2 and +1. Now you know that f'(x) is continous everywhere so f(x) is differentiable everywhere. Therefore, since f(x) is differentiable everywhere (-infinity, infinity), then it is differentiable on (0, sqrt(8)). So the function satisfies the two hypotheses of the Mean Value Theorem. You definitely wouldn't have to write this long for a test or homework; its probably one or two lines of explanation at most. But I hope this is understandable enough to apply to other similar questions!
Read More: ...

what two numbers multiplied together equal -8 and added together equal 6?

If the numbers are a and b, we have ab=-8 and a+b=6. We can replace b with 6-a in the first equation: a(6-a)=-8 so 6a-a^2=-8. Rearranging: a^2-6a-8=0 and completing the square: a^2-6a+9-17=0. Therefore (a-3)^2=17. Taking the square root of each side we have a-3=+sqrt(17) and a=3+sqrt(17) and b=6-(3+sqrt(17))=3-sqrt(17), which is the other alternative for a, so whichever way round the two numbers are 3+sqrt(17)=7.1231 and -1.1231 (approx). Add them together and we get 6; multiply them and we get -8.
Read More: ...

what 2 numbers when multiplied equal 30 but added equal -10?

xy = 30 x + y = -10 x = -y - 10 (-y-10)(y) = 30 -y^2 - 10y = 30 y^2 + 10y + 30 = 0 quadratic formula y = (-10 +- sqrt(100 - 4(1)(30)))/2(1) y = (-10 +- sqrt(100 - 120))/2 y = (-10 +- sqrt(-20))/2 Can't take the square root of a negative number. No solution. Answer:  There are no numbers that, when multiplied, equal 30, but when added equal -10. . Note:  There sort of are two numbers that work, but it's a thing called 'complex math' that you won't encounter in Algebra 1.  For an Algebra 1 class/student, the answer is 'no solution.'
Read More: ...

Tips for a great answer:

- Provide details, support with references or personal experience .
- If you need clarification, ask it in the comment box .
- It's 100% free, no registration required.
next Question || Previos Question
  • Start your question with What, Why, How, When, etc. and end with a "?"
  • Be clear and specific
  • Use proper spelling and grammar
all rights reserved to the respective owners || www.math-problems-solved.com || Terms of Use || Contact || Privacy Policy
Load time: 0.1912 seconds